This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/30/2022 at 02:32:16 (UTC).

ST JOHN HEALTH SYSTEM INC V. CHRISTINA DAWN TATE

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 ST JOHN HEALTH SYSTEM INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTINA DAWN TATE. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is VACLAW, RUSSELL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0291

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

VACLAW, RUSSELL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST JOHN HEALTH SYSTEM INC

Defendant

TATE, CHRISTINA DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LENTZ, JARED C

1437 South Boulder, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

WORKS & LENTZ INC

1437 S Boulder Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

SMITH, B JACK

WEBB, DAN M

Attorney at WORKS & LENTZ INC

1437 S Boulder Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

LENTZ, SUSAN E

Attorney at WORKS & LENTZ

1437 S Boulder, Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

HOWLETT, ANNETTE P

1437 S Boulder, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETD SERVED CHRISTINA DAWN TATE 7-19-18 (GP)

08/01/2018: SUMMONS RETD SERVED CHRISTINA DAWN TATE 7-19-18 (GP)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT(JAD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISCHARGE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT-NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (GP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RET'D SERVED; CERT MAIL 11-23-18 (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION(JAD); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBB, DAN M