This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 09:01:44 (UTC).

SOUTHERN PLAINS MED CTR OF GARVIN C, ET. AL. V. RS PLUMBING, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 SOUTHERN PLAINS MED CTR OF GARVIN C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RS PLUMBING. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARDS, LEAH and KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

EDWARDS, LEAH

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN PLAINS MED CTR OF GARVIN C

SOUTHERN PLAINS HOSPITAL CORP

Defendants

SHORT, RONALD

RS PLUMBING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COULTER, STEPHANIE

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN & PITTS PLLC

1503 E 19Th St

Edmond, OK 73013

RENNIE, ROBERT T JR

118 N Chickasaw

Pauls Valley, OK 73075

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

04/21/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

PROOF OF SERVICE

05/20/2021: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF PLNTFS' WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

04/01/2022: NOTICE OF PLNTFS' WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

ORDER (SK)

04/29/2022: ORDER (SK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FOLLOW W/IN 10DAYS. (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PARTIES. FORMAL STIPULATION FOR BOND RELEASE & DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POUNDAGE; 2) MUTUAL DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE, BY ALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BOND WILL BE RELEASED & EXONERATED TO PLNTFS W/O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: S/O: PARTIES SET FOR TRIAL ANNOUNCE SETTLEMENT: 1) LEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REQUIREMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO DENY DEFT'S TRIAL SUBMISSIONS & TO WAIVE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR , IN THE ALTERNATIVE,

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coulter, Stephanie