This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 22:24:21 (UTC).

Sorrell, Kevin D. v. Rohan, Angelina Dawn

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Sorrell, Kevin D filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Rohan, Angelina Dawn. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-12

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sorrell, Kevin D.

Sorrell, Kimberly

Defendants

Rohan, Angelina Dawn

Henke, Charles R

Johnston, Lawrence

Lattimore, Carla Lee

Smith, Brian K

Smith, Britt Wayne

Smith, Steven W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Unruh, Brooke H

1930 S Bryant Ave

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/17/2022: ORDER FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/17/2022: APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

03/10/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER -JANUARY 26, FEBRUARY 2, 9 2022)

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER -JANUARY 26, FEBRUARY 2, 9 2022)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

01/21/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STEVEN SMITH

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STEVEN SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON LAWRENCE JOHNSTON

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON LAWRENCE JOHNSTON

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON BRITT SMITH

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON BRITT SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CARLA LATTIMORE

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CARLA LATTIMORE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE / ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED / COPY OF CERT MAIL; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER -JANUARY 26, FEBRUARY 2, 9 2022); Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: QUIET; Description: QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Count: 1; Party: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: QUIET TITLE(QUIET); Filed By: Sorrell, Kevin D.

    Read MoreRead Less