This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/03/2023 at 07:14:29 (UTC).

SHELBY MARIE SUTTON V. TIMOTHY MICHAEL TIPPINS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 SHELBY MARIE SUTTON filed an Other lawsuit against TIMOTHY MICHAEL TIPPINS. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0018

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUTTON, SHELBY MARIE

Defendant

TIPPINS, TIMOTHY MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OFFICER, TROY

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR

01/17/2023: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE -TROY OFFICER

01/20/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE -TROY OFFICER

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO TIMOTHY TIPPINS 1-18-23

01/20/2023: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO TIMOTHY TIPPINS 1-18-23

FILE CM: CONT TO 2-8-23 AT 9:00AM.

01/27/2023: FILE CM: CONT TO 2-8-23 AT 9:00AM.

FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG

01/27/2023: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG

FILE CM: CONT TO MAY 10, 2023 AT 9:00AM

02/09/2023: FILE CM: CONT TO MAY 10, 2023 AT 9:00AM

FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG ON PETITION

02/09/2023: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG ON PETITION

 

Docket Entries

05/10/2023

HearingEvent: PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG ON PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CM: CONT TO MAY 10, 2023 AT 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

HearingEvent: PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HRG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CM: CONT TO 2-8-23 AT 9:00AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

HearingEvent: PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO TIMOTHY TIPPINS 1-18-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE -TROY OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POTT CO TO SERVE; Amount: $ 50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less