This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:58:24 (UTC).

SHARON AL RIFAI, ET. AL. V. MARGARET BRIGGS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 SHARON AL RIFAI filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MARGARET BRIGGS. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0092

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AL RIFAI, SHARON

EVANS, HATCH

A.E. MINOR

Defendant

BRIGGS, MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BISHER, RICK

4323 Nw 63Rd, Ste 110

Okc, OK 73116

BEGIN, ERIC

1800 South Baltimore, Suite 550

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

07/07/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

FILE JOINT MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE

10/29/2021: FILE JOINT MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE

FILE ORDER

10/29/2021: FILE ORDER

FILE ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

04/07/2022: FILE ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DEFENDANT ESTATE OF MARGARET BRIGG'S ANSWER TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOINT MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less