This case was last updated from Comanche County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 00:59:12 (UTC).

SERVICE LOANS, Plaintiff, v. MICHAEL BATTIEST, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 SERVICE LOANS, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL BATTIEST, Defendant. This case was filed in Comanche County Courts, Comanche County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1780

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Comanche, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERVICE LOANS

Defendant

BATTIEST, MICHAEL

Garnishee

RIVERSIDE INDIAN SCHOOL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCode: DISM; Description: DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY RIVERSIDE INDINA SCHOOL $0; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketCode: RETCM; Description: RETURN RECEIPT CERT. MAIL DELIVERED TO ? NO DATE GIVEN; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-660113 ON 12/27/2018. PAYOR: SERVICE LOANS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-1780: $83.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-1780: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1780: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. SC-2018-1780: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1780: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. SC-2018-1780: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1780: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: GSIM; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - MAIL; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: DJE; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED / JUDGE ZWAAN FOR KEN HARRIS 255.00 + 108.00 CC+ PPS + 6.5%; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL BATTIEST WITH FATHER 7/10/18; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-642435 ON 06/22/2018. PAYOR: SERVICE LOANS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-1780: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-1780: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-1780: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT / JUDGE HARRIS 07/24/18 @ 9:00 AM; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: SERVICE LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less