This case was last updated from Lincoln County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 09:59:05 (UTC).

SELENE FINANCE LP V. SPOUSE IF ANY OF PAUL M VASSER, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 SELENE FINANCE LP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SPOUSE IF ANY OF PAUL M VASSER. This case was filed in Lincoln County Courts, Lincoln County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ASHWOOD, CYNTHIA FERRELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0112

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Lincoln, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ASHWOOD, CYNTHIA FERRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELENE FINANCE LP

Defendants

SHEETS, KERRI D.

SPOUSE IF ANY OF PAUL M VASSER

DOE, JANE

DOE, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HARRIS, SCOTT D.

2225 W Hefner Raod, Suite 300, P.O. Box 21863

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

TIMBERLAKE, DON J

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE, PC

4200 Perimeter Center Drive, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

PARROTT, BLAKE C

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE, PC

Po Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS W/NO SERVICE TO JOHN DOE, OWNER OCCUPIED FILED

08/22/2018: SUMMONS W/NO SERVICE TO JOHN DOE, OWNER OCCUPIED FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

03/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

03/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

CM: JUDGE ASHWOOD

03/13/2019: CM: JUDGE ASHWOOD

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

03/13/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXECUTION, RESTORING NOTE AND MORTGAGE AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT, QUASHING 1ST ALIAS SPECIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMBERLAKE, DON J