This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 10:09:53 (UTC).

SECURITY STATE BANK OF OKLA. V. JANE DOE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 SECURITY STATE BANK OF OKLA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JANE DOE,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0373

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY STATE BANK OF OKLA.

Defendants

GAMBLE, JACKIE

GAMBLE, LACHRISA

SIQUEIROS, MONICA

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL

THE BANK N.A.

JANE DOE

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PITTS, RYAN H

SUTTON, PAUL

MAYE, KIERAN D.

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

11/16/2022: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS -PAUL E.

12/15/2022: FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS -PAUL E.

FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS- PAUL E

12/28/2022: FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS- PAUL E

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- MONICA, SERVED 12-7-22

01/03/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- MONICA, SERVED 12-7-22

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- LACHRISA, SERVED 12-7-22

01/03/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- LACHRISA, SERVED 12-7-22

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JACKIE, SERVED 12-7-22

01/03/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JACKIE, SERVED 12-7-22

FILE SUMMONS & REUTRN- JOHN DOE/JANE DOE, NOT FOUND

01/03/2023: FILE SUMMONS & REUTRN- JOHN DOE/JANE DOE, NOT FOUND

FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, JACKIE GAMBLE'S, LACHRISA

01/05/2023: FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, JACKIE GAMBLE'S, LACHRISA

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF THE BANK N.A. DISCLAIMER

01/12/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF THE BANK N.A. DISCLAIMER

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- THE BANK NA,

01/27/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- THE BANK NA,

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2-17-23

01/27/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2-17-23

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- KYLA WILLINGHAM

02/06/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- KYLA WILLINGHAM

FILE ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL OKLAHOMA

02/06/2023: FILE ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL OKLAHOMA

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TAX COMMISSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL OKLAHOMA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- KYLA WILLINGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2-17-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- THE BANK NA,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND CONSENT TO JUDGMENT IN REM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF THE BANK N.A. DISCLAIMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GAMBLE'S, AND MONICA SIQUEIROS'S SPECIAL APPERANCE AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, JACKIE GAMBLE'S, LACHRISA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less