This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 06:27:16 (UTC).

SECURITY FINANCE V. MELISSA MACY

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 SECURITY FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MELISSA MACY. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0050

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY FINANCE

Defendant

MACY, MELISSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CARD RETURN - HPS - 12-17-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEES ANSWER AFFIDAVIT - $180.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT - CONTINUING; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN AFFIDAVIT/ORDER - PERS SERV - 8-25-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING AFFIDAVIT/ORDER - UNDER $5000; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less