This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 21:57:15 (UTC).

SECURITY FINANCE, ET. AL. V. JERICA JEANNE CALLOWAY

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 SECURITY FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JERICA JEANNE CALLOWAY. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DIRICKSON, DONNA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0346

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DIRICKSON, DONNA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SECURITY FINANCE

OF OKLAHOMA

LLC

Defendant

CALLOWAY, JERICA JEANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES TO PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EACH 17TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER UNTIL JUDGMENT IS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF TO PAY 77.50 MONTHLY B E GINNING 08/17/2018 AND ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 123.00 COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1581.82 PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON JURY JUDGMENT ;FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CUSTER CO BY TODD DOUGLAS GREER PS 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 08/06/2018 AT 1930 W. GARY CLINTON,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SERVE BY PROCESS SERVER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less