This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/08/2023 at 02:48:28 (UTC).

SAMMY D/B/A ST. LOUIS SALVAGE YOUNG V. DALLAS KELSER

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 SAMMY D/B/A ST LOUIS SALVAGE YOUNG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DALLAS KELSER. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0198

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, SAMMY D/B/A ST. LOUIS SALVAGE

Defendant

KELSER, DALLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SAVAGE, DILLAN

PETTIS, JIM COLE

MILLER, MARIANNE

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

05/26/2022: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING 7-5-22 AT 9:00AM

05/27/2022: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING 7-5-22 AT 9:00AM

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER- DALLAS, SERVED BY

05/31/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER- DALLAS, SERVED BY

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- DILLIAN SAVAGE & JIM COLE

07/29/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- DILLIAN SAVAGE & JIM COLE

FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE

08/02/2022: FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE

FILE ORDER CONTINUTING HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

08/02/2022: FILE ORDER CONTINUTING HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

08/02/2022: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

08/02/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

08/31/2022: FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

FILE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

09/02/2022: FILE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

09/06/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

09/29/2022: FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

FILE RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM AND AMENDED PETITION

10/26/2022: FILE RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM AND AMENDED PETITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM AND AMENDED PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SAMMY YOUNG D/B/A ST. LOUIS SALVAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER CONTINUTING HEARING- 9-6-22 AT 10:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less