This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 01/04/2022 at 17:56:03 (UTC).

SAINT FRANCIS HEALTH SYSTEM INC, Plaintiff, v. Christopher Cannon, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 SAINT FRANCIS HEALTH SYSTEM INC, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher Cannon, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2053

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saint Francis Health System Inc

Defendant

Cannon, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELOTTA, GEORGE W II

Attorney at BERMAN & RABIN, P.A.

12101 North Mcarthur Boulevardsuite A #201

Oklahoma City, OK 73162

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHRISTOPHER CANNON BY SERV RONNIE CANNON 8/10/18

08/24/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHRISTOPHER CANNON BY SERV RONNIE CANNON 8/10/18

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

09/11/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Deborrah Ludi Leitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: Cannon, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: LUDI LEITCH, DEBORRAH: PLAIN APPEARED. DEFENDANT APPEARED JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE PLAIN AS FOLLOWS: (1) THE PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT SET FORTH HEREIN, AND (2) COURT COSTS AGAINST THE NAMED DEFENDANT. JUDGE SIGNED FINAL J.E. --- PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT = $549.01 DEFENDANT TO PAY $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 10-30-18; Count: 1; Party: Cannon, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 77195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHRISTOPHER CANNON BY SERV RONNIE CANNON 8/10/18; Party: Cannon, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-3799604 ON 07/20/2018. PAYOR: FMS INC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-12053: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-12053: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-12053: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE OTEY, MILLIE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: A/; Description: AMOUNT IN DEBT OF 549.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: Saint Francis Health System Inc

    Read MoreRead Less