This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 08:33:50 (UTC).

Retlow Inc An Oklahoma Corporation, Plaintiff, v. Dorothy Grimett, Defendant, and John Grimett, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Retlow Inc An Oklahoma Corporation, Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Dorothy Grimett, Defendant, and John Grimett, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-257

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Retlow Inc An Oklahoma Corporation

Defendants

Grimett, Dorothy

Grimett, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruner, David A

Attorney at Whiting & Bruner, PLLC

6440 S Lewis Avenue, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74136

Defendant Attorneys

McHugh, Brendan M

P O Box 1392

Claremore, OK 74018

Jim, Dana

P.O. Box 1011

Vinita, OK 74301

 

Court Documents

PETITION

09/03/2021: PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

09/03/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER, COUNTER CLAIM AND CROSS-CLAIM

05/11/2022: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER, COUNTER CLAIM AND CROSS-CLAIM

JUDGE CONDREN: CASE COMES ON FOR HEARING. PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY AARON BRUNER. THE DFT JOHN GRIMETT IS PERSONALLY PRESENT WITH ATTY BRENDAN MCHUGH. ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD. THE DFT PETITION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SUSTAINED. THE DFTS ARE GRA

03/30/2022: JUDGE CONDREN: CASE COMES ON FOR HEARING. PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY AARON BRUNER. THE DFT JOHN GRIMETT IS PERSONALLY PRESENT WITH ATTY BRENDAN MCHUGH. ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD. THE DFT PETITION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SUSTAINED. THE DFTS ARE GRANTED A NEW TRIAL. THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. ORDER TO BE PREPARED BY ATTY MCHUGH.

SHERIFF'S SALE RECALLED

02/08/2022: SHERIFF'S SALE RECALLED

PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

01/20/2022: PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO THE DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

01/20/2022: PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO THE DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

12/30/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/30/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/30/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

12/30/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/30/2021: DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER FIXING COMMISSIONERS' FEES

12/16/2021: ORDER FIXING COMMISSIONERS' FEES

BILL OF APPRAISERS (KATHY PERRY $150, GAYLE COPPINGER $150 & JOAN ROBERTS $150)

12/14/2021: BILL OF APPRAISERS (KATHY PERRY $150, GAYLE COPPINGER $150 & JOAN ROBERTS $150)

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

12/09/2021: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/10/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/10/2021: MOTION FOR JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER, COUNTER CLAIM AND CROSS-CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: DEF PETITION TO VACATE/DEF MOTION TO DISMISS; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: CASE COMES ON FOR HEARING. PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY AARON BRUNER. THE DFT JOHN GRIMETT IS PERSONALLY PRESENT WITH ATTY BRENDAN MCHUGH. ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD. THE DFT PETITION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SUSTAINED. THE DFTS ARE GRANTED A NEW TRIAL. THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. ORDER TO BE PREPARED BY ATTY MCHUGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SSR; Description: SHERIFF'S SALE RECALLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: PLAIN , RETLOW INC'S ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO THE DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-656427 ON 12/30/2021. PAYOR: JIM/DANA G TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-257: $32.20 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2021-257: $1.92 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. CJ-2021-257: $0.64 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-257: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2021-257: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-257: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2021-257: $0.95 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-257: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-257: $9.75 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CJ-2021-257: AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE -$0.25CJ-2021-257: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63CJ-2021-257: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.03CJ-2021-257: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02CJ-2021-257: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04CJ-2021-257: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13CJ-2021-257: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.02CJ-2021-257: AC01 CLERK FEES -$0.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 1.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OSH; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Retlow Inc An Oklahoma Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less