This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 05:59:45 (UTC).

REPUBLIC LOANS V. JEANNA COLWELL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 REPUBLIC LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEANNA COLWELL. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0471

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REPUBLIC LOANS

Defendant

COLWELL, JEANNA

 

Court Documents

RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED JEANNA COLWELL 7-18-18

07/23/2018: RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED JEANNA COLWELL 7-18-18

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: GARN. ANSWER- $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: GARN. ANSWER - $149.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: GARN. ANSWER - $164.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: GARN. ANSWER- $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: 1-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: RET. GARN. SUMMONS - TOYE WEAVER SIGNED FOR HSI; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: ISSUANCE OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT SUMMONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: $488.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: DEFAULT JUDGMENT, $390.00 + 58.00 CC + 40.00 PPS =

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED JEANNA COLWELL 7-18-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less