This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 05/30/2022 at 02:01:01 (UTC).

REFUGIO OLIVAR V. HIRAM PIAMO

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 REFUGIO OLIVAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HIRAM PIAMO. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0330

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVAR, REFUGIO

Defendant

PIAMO, HIRAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE LETTER FROM TYSON NO LONGER EMPLOYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RET. REC. CERT. #70180680000053464796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE 7018 0680 0000 5346 4796; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDG 400.00 + 108.00CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE WARRANT RETURN/SERVED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MELISSA SMITH TO SERVE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less