This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 06:46:45 (UTC).

RED RIVER FINANCE V. TABETHA THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 RED RIVER FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TABETHA THOMPSON. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANKS, KYRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0481

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Washington, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FRANKS, KYRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED RIVER FINANCE

Defendant

THOMPSON, TABETHA

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RET'D SERVED TABETHA THOMPSON

08/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RET'D SERVED TABETHA THOMPSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: $30.00/BI WEEKLY BEGINING 09-05-18. (CDR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: OF $432.50 PLUS THE COSTS OF $98.00. DEFT AGREES TO PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: ENTERS A JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLTF FOR THE AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: MEET & ANNOUNCE AGREEMENT. CRT ADOPTS ANNOUNCEMENT &

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: CM:FRANKS- PLTF W/OUT ATTY- DEFT W/OUT ATTY. PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: 8-20-18 (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RET'D SERVED; TABETHA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER, ISSUED (RET'D TO PLTF FOR SERV) (SM; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less