This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 19:31:03 (UTC).

RED RIVER CREDIT V. GENE REECE

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 RED RIVER CREDIT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GENE REECE. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0197

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED RIVER CREDIT

Defendant

REECE, GENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 11/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RET'D- SIGNED BY ? FOR CHICKASAW NATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (LE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $1,853.54 + COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REECE BY SERVING SAM REECE 8/4/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS AFFID RET'D- SERVED GENE (JEAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED (BY PPS); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED (BY PPS); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less