This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 04:36:40 (UTC).

RED RIVER CREDIT CORPORATION V. TWYLA JUNE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 RED RIVER CREDIT CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TWYLA JUNE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0091

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED RIVER CREDIT CORPORATION

Defendant

WILLIAMS, TWYLA JUNE

 

Court Documents

FAXED ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

05/04/2021: FAXED ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

05/05/2021: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

05/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

PAYMENT AGREEMENT FILE AND SCAN

05/05/2021: PAYMENT AGREEMENT FILE AND SCAN

ORIGINAL SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

05/05/2021: ORIGINAL SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

DELIVERY VERFICATION FILE AND SCAN

06/15/2021: DELIVERY VERFICATION FILE AND SCAN

CM: SCJ

07/06/2021: CM: SCJ

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE DEFENDANT'S PAYCHECK ON JULY 7, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROMPTLY BE PAID TO PLAIN . THIS ORDER BEGINS WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALL SUCH FUNDS WITHHELD PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER SHALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FULL OR UNTIL THE 180 DAY GARNISHMENT PERIOD EXPIRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE DEFENDANT'S PAYCHECKS UNTIL THE JUDGMENT IS PAID IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DAY GARNISHMENT PERIOD THE SUM OF $36.00 FROM EACH OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FROM THE DEFENDANT'S WAGES FOR THE REMAINDER OF THE 180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUSTAINED IN PART. GARNISHEE IS ORDERED TO WITHHOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 108.00 COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 622.10 PLAINITFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CUSTER CO BY JOHN FOWLER PS 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 04/10/2021 AT 102 1/2 E COURT, CLINTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAXED ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SERVE BY PROCESS SERVER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less