This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 12:19:30 (UTC).

RED RIVER CREDIT CORP. V. KENDRA MOORE

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 RED RIVER CREDIT CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KENDRA MOORE. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, RAFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0203

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, RAFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED RIVER CREDIT CORP.

Defendant

MOORE, KENDRA

 

Court Documents

RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER -SERVED KENDRA MOORE

08/12/2021: RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER -SERVED KENDRA MOORE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN TO SENDER UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT W/CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT W/CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT - KTISTEN LAMB - 08/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS - CERT. MAIL TO MANGUM SKILLED NURSING; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 8/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER -SERVED KENDRA MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED APPLICATION WITH ORDER - TAKEN FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less