This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 03/28/2022 at 20:27:11 (UTC).

RED CROWN CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff, v. PRENTIS ELLIOT, Defendant, and AQUANETTE HARRIS ELLIOT, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 RED CROWN CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRENTIS ELLIOT, Defendant, and AQUANETTE HARRIS ELLIOT, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1426

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED CROWN CREDIT UNION

Defendants

ELLIOT, AQUANETTE HARRIS

ELLIOT, PRENTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER, TIMOTHY A

Attorney at FISHER & FISHER

P.O. Box 700870

Tulsa, OK 74170

 

Court Documents

PETITION

05/17/2021: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

05/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / C TO TW

06/29/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / C TO TW

ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

06/29/2021: ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( TULSA WORLD )

08/25/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( TULSA WORLD )

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE / SET FOR 11-17-21 @ 2 PM IN COURT ROOM 708 / AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

10/14/2021: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE / SET FOR 11-17-21 @ 2 PM IN COURT ROOM 708 / AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT / A TO J

10/25/2021: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT / A TO J

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFS

11/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/16/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Party: RED CROWN CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: STAY; Description: STAY EXECUTION UNTIL 12-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFS; Party: ELLIOT, PRENTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE - PF - TIMOTHY FISHER & KRISTIN BLUE FISHER; Docket: Civil Docket A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: ELLIOT, PRENTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: ELLIOT, AQUANETTE HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPJE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,318.04 PLUS INTEREST, OOSTS AND FEES.; Count: 1; Party: ELLIOT, PRENTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPJE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,318.04 PLUS INTEREST, OOSTS AND FEES.; Count: 1; Party: ELLIOT, AQUANETTE HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NIGHTINGALE, REBECCA: CASE COMES ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. TIMOTHY FISHER APPEARS FOR PLAIN . DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APREAR. MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED. JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,318.04 PLUS INTEREST, OOSTS AND FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT / A TO J; Party: RED CROWN CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: RED CROWN CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less