This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 04:12:03 (UTC).

REBECCA ANNE HARRIS V. SHERRY DAWN OGEE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 REBECCA ANNE HARRIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHERRY DAWN OGEE. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, GREGORY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0065

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, GREGORY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS, REBECCA ANNE

Defendant

OGEE, SHERRY DAWN

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

08/19/2021: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

SUMMONS RETURNED MCSO SERVED/SHERRY OGEE

08/30/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED MCSO SERVED/SHERRY OGEE

CM: (XX) DEFENDANT STATES SHE IS GOING TO BE TESTED FOR

08/31/2021: CM: (XX) DEFENDANT STATES SHE IS GOING TO BE TESTED FOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER & JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 AT 10:15 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COVID-19. MS. HARRIS AGREED TO A CONTINUATION UNTIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: (XX) DEFENDANT STATES SHE IS GOING TO BE TESTED FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED MCSO SERVED/SHERRY OGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS IMCSO/SHERRY OGEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less