This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 18:14:41 (UTC).

RC RENTALS V. JAMES CUPP, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 RC RENTALS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES CUPP. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0228

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RE RENTALS

RC RENTALS

Defendants

CUPP, JAMES

GREEN, MORGAN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIL AND SCAN

09/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIL AND SCAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10/31/2021 AT MIDNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 1015 DELARICE APT 2 WEATHERFORD, CUSTER CO BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANTS TO RETURN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 188.00 COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WEATHERFORD, CUSTER CO BY BRANDON BARTON PS 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 09/30/2021 AT 1015 DELARICE APT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE ;FIL AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SERVE BY PROCESS SERVER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less