This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/08/2022 at 22:39:02 (UTC).

RANDY HEGER V. PETER FRIESEN

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 RANDY HEGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETER FRIESEN. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DIRICKSON, DONNA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0407

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DIRICKSON, DONNA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEGER, RANDY

Defendant

FRIESEN, PETER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TOMORROW. MAILING HIM A DISMISSAL THIS DATE DG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAINITFF CALLS, HE WISHED TO DISMISS THE CASE FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WEATHERFORD, CUSTER CO BY KARLIN BARRETT CUSTER CO SO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 09/12/2018 AT 24103 E 1000 ROAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less