This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 18:13:42 (UTC).

QC HOLDINGS DBA LEND NATION V. SPENCER ANTHONY TUGGLE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 QC HOLDINGS DBA LEND NATION filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPENCER ANTHONY TUGGLE. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is REHEARD, DEBORAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0304

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

REHEARD, DEBORAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QC HOLDINGS DBA LEND NATION

Defendant

TUGGLE, SPENCER ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT ISS TO SPENCER TUGGLE BY PPS

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT ISS TO SPENCER TUGGLE BY PPS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: GARNISHMENT ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($198.88)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUN; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK REV FUND; Amount: $ 0.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REV FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/MAILING; Amount: $ 73.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT GRANTED $462.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MIN: REHEARD: PLT APPEARS, DEF NOT, DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPENCER TUGGLE 09-24-21 BY PPS DUKE $50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RET'D FILED SERVED KRISTI ERBY (MOM) FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT ISS TO SPENCER TUGGLE BY PPS DUKE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less