This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/06/2023 at 04:58:27 (UTC).

QC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC DBA V. RAILEE SHARRICE JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 QC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC DBA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAILEE SHARRICE JAMES. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC DBA

Defendant

JAMES, RAILEE SHARRICE

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

01/13/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

FILE AFFIDAVIT AS OF MILITARY SERVICE

01/13/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS OF MILITARY SERVICE

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO RAILEE JAMES ON 1-28-23 $45

02/02/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO RAILEE JAMES ON 1-28-23 $45

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

03/01/2023: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

FILE RELEASE

04/18/2023: FILE RELEASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9.50% INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $538.26 PLUS COURT COST, PROCESS SERVER FEE, AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN APPEARED, DEF NOT; JUDGMENT FOR PLAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO RAILEE JAMES ON 1-28-23 $45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS OF MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 3-1-23 AT 9:00 AM SPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less