This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 06:13:48 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE CAR FINANCE V. TAMARA BROWN, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 PROGRESSIVE CAR FINANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAMARA BROWN. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CULVER, MCAFFREY & DENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0163

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CULVER, MCAFFREY & DENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE CAR FINANCE

Defendants

BROWN, TAMARA

BROWN, EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCCART, JASON

Attorney at REYNOLDS, RIDINGS, VOGT & MCCART

101 Park Avenue, Suite 1010

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT. MAIL RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND- EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION $10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCART, JASON