This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 15:20:12 (UTC).

PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY, Plaintiff, v. EDMUND MCCARTNEY JR, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDMUND MCCARTNEY JR, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodward, Paul K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-9

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Woodward, Paul K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY

Defendant

MCCARTNEY, EDMUND BOYD JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMBERLAKE, DON

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE, PC

P O Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION - $80,000.00

06/24/2022: APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION - $80,000.00

NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED SATISFIED

06/24/2022: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED SATISFIED

EXECUTION ISSUED SHERIFF SALE (COURT ORDERED)

06/20/2022: EXECUTION ISSUED SHERIFF SALE (COURT ORDERED)

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/20/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/25/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/10/2022: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

05/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - 25649

03/23/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - 25649

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JANE DOE

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JANE DOE

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JOHN DOE

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JOHN DOE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LINDA DUNLAP PERSONALLY 2/1/22

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LINDA DUNLAP PERSONALLY 2/1/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOY MCCARTNEY PERSONALLY 1/27/22

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOY MCCARTNEY PERSONALLY 1/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: EDMUND MCCARTNEY PERSONALLY SERVED 1/27/22

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: EDMUND MCCARTNEY PERSONALLY SERVED 1/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SPOUSE OF LINDA DUNLAP SERVED 2/1/22

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SPOUSE OF LINDA DUNLAP SERVED 2/1/22

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

02/22/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCode: POUND; Description: POUNDAGE; Amount: $ 4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCode: #AFR; Description: APPRAISER FEE RECEIVED WITH POUNDAGE - DENNIS WILSON, DAVID DICK, SALLY ORINGDERFF; Amount: $ 445.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APRPM; Description: APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION - $80,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOSS; Description: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ERS; Description: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Docket: Paul K Woodward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: MCCARTNEY, EDMUND BOYD JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-521133 ON 06/20/2022. PAYOR: BAER & TIMBERLAKE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 601.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-9: $37.50 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2022-9: $75.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. CJ-2022-9: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-9: $445.50 ON AC42 APPRAISER FEES RECEIVED - CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2022-9: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2022-9: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-9: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2022-9: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-9: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-9: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMBERLAKE, DON