This case was last updated from McClain County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 05:03:32 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES V. KARI A SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against KARI A SMITH. This case was filed in McClain County Courts, McClain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SHILLING, LELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0171

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    McClain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SHILLING, LELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

SMITH, KARI A

Blanchard, OK 73010-6974

 

Court Documents

ISSUE SUMMONS

08/11/2021: ISSUE SUMMONS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/08/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & JOURNAL

10/08/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & JOURNAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & JOURNAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less