This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 22:10:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES V. CHRISTINA KELLEY

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTINA KELLEY. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERING, CYNTHIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERING, CYNTHIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

KELLEY, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAUSCH, JULIA

5200 S. Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

RAUSCH, JULIE

5200 S. Yale Ave, Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTR OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND JOURNAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CHRISTINA KELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTINA KELLEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAUSCH, JULIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAUSCH, JULIE