This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 06:15:44 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Plaintiff, v. Pamela L Johnson, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pamela L Johnson, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-51

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Johnson, Pamela L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tait, Nicholas

Rausch Sturm Llp, 5200 South Yale Avenue Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/24/2020: PETITION

ANSWER

02/12/2020: ANSWER

NOTICE OF DISPOSITION DOCKET

07/26/2021: NOTICE OF DISPOSITION DOCKET

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

08/20/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/20/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER FOR HEARING

08/24/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/13/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY JAMES ZARONES PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. MOTION SUSTAINED. ORDER SIGNED.

10/13/2021: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY JAMES ZARONES PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. MOTION SUSTAINED. ORDER SIGNED.

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/16/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

02/18/2022: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Johnson, Pamela L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Johnson, Pamela L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY JAMES ZARONES PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. MOTION SUSTAINED. ORDER SIGNED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-648299 ON 08/20/2021. PAYOR: RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL, ENERSON, 7 HORNIK LLC ATTORNEYS AT LAW TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-51: $50.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less