This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 03/20/2022 at 05:26:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, Plaintiff, v. DARLA GERMAN, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DARLA GERMAN, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5910

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GERMAN, DARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOESE, KALEB

Raush, Sturm, Israel, 5200 S Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

PETITION

08/02/2018: PETITION

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. FOR DARLA GERMAN TO RESIDENT WHO REFUSED TO IDENTIFY THEMSELF / RES SRV / ON 8-17-18 / BY PS

08/21/2018: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. FOR DARLA GERMAN TO RESIDENT WHO REFUSED TO IDENTIFY THEMSELF / RES SRV / ON 8-17-18 / BY PS

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/06/2020: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: GERMAN, DARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: GERMAN, DARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: GERMAN, DARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 77195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: S; Description: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. FOR DARLA GERMAN TO RESIDENT WHO REFUSED TO IDENTIFY THEMSELF / RES SRV / ON 8-17-18 / BY PS; Party: GERMAN, DARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-3805481 ON 08/02/2018. PAYOR: RAUSCH STURM TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-5910: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-5910: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2018-5910: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-5910: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-5910: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-5910: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2018-5910: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-5910: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-5910: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-5910: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2018-5910: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE PACE, KIRSTEN TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOESE, KALEB