This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 03/31/2022 at 23:41:03 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVER ASSOCIATES V. JENNIFER HARMON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVER ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JENNIFER HARMON. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0106

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVER ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HARMON, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MEADORS-FOUDA, AMBER

5200 S. Yale Avenue, Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL & ENTRY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL & ENTRY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK RECOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEADORS-FOUDA, AMBER