This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 12:08:38 (UTC).

PONCA FINANCE DBA YES FINANCE V. HEHEDIG BARDALES

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 PONCA FINANCE DBA YES FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEHEDIG BARDALES. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JETT, A. CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0160

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JETT, A. CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONCA FINANCE DBA YES FINANCE

Defendant

BARDALES, HEHEDIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: CC MEMO: MAILED COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: ARTICLE #: 7017 2620 0000 8887 7335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: SIGNED BY: TANDI CHRISTIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL - DATED: NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: ARTICLE #7017 2620 0000 8887 7335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: MAILING FEE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: COPY FEE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: AT 6.50% FROM TODAY AND COURT COSTS OF $108.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: STIPULATES. JUDGMENT FOR PLTF FOR $1,240.00, STAT INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: BOTH PARTIES APPEAR. SWORN TESTIMONY. DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: CM: MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SERVED & RETURNED: 8/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: SHERIFF $50 FEE PD DIRECTLY TO TCSO W/CK #5767

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less