This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:11:50 (UTC).

PLAZA SERVICES, LLC V. ROBYN REEVES, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PLAZA SERVICES, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROBYN REEVES,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAZA SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

REEVES, ROBYN

REEVES, JON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FABER & BRAND LLC

Attorney at FABER & BRAND LLC

Po Box 10110

Columbia, MO 65205

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

01/22/2020: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- LEFT A COPY WITH DYLON

06/01/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- LEFT A COPY WITH DYLON

FILE AFFIDAIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/16/2020: FILE AFFIDAIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/16/2020: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/16/2020: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -TINKER AIR FORCE BASE

12/17/2020: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -TINKER AIR FORCE BASE

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -CENTRAL TRUST BANK

06/09/2022: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -CENTRAL TRUST BANK

FILE RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

07/08/2022: FILE RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -PLAZA SERGVICES, LLC

09/27/2022: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -PLAZA SERGVICES, LLC

FILE RETURN OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

11/03/2022: FILE RETURN OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

FILE ANSWER TO COURT

11/03/2022: FILE ANSWER TO COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less