This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:46:05 (UTC).

PATTERSON, DEBORAH v. BEAN, LEONARD LEON

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 PATTERSON, DEBORAH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BEAN, LEONARD LEON. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, L. Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-8

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, L. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATTERSON, DEBORAH

BEAN, DARRELL GENE

Defendants

BEAN, LEONARD LEON

ANDREWS, LISA MARIE

BEAN, ALFRED

BEAN, BRENDA

BEAN, CURTIS

BEAN, JOE

BEAN, LARRY WAYNE

BEAN, LENORA LYNN

BEAN, LORENE

BEAN, LUCHIN WAYNE

BEAN, MICHAEL

BEAN, MICHAEL KIRK

BEAN, SANFORD

BIRDWELL, VIRGINIA

JEANTET, EMILY

JEANTET, GARY L

RUSH, CAROLYN

RUSH, RONALD R.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEEN, RALPH F

205 West Division

Stilwell, OK 74960

Defendant Attorney

BIRDWELL, DWIGHT W.

217 North Harvey Ave Suite 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

04/18/2022: ANSWER

LETTER

03/31/2022: LETTER

COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

03/31/2022: COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DEPUTY WARDEN EMMER BRANCH FOR LEONARD LEON BEAN

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DEPUTY WARDEN EMMER BRANCH FOR LEONARD LEON BEAN

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: EMILY JEANTET 01/28/2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: EMILY JEANTET 01/28/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: GARY JEANTET 01/28/2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: GARY JEANTET 01/28/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: BRENDA BEAN

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: BRENDA BEAN

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: VIRGINIA BEAN BIRDWELL 01/28/2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: VIRGINIA BEAN BIRDWELL 01/28/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ALFRED BEAN 1-29-2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ALFRED BEAN 1-29-2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANNETTA FIELDS FOR CURTIS BEAN 01-31-2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANNETTA FIELDS FOR CURTIS BEAN 01-31-2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANNETTA FIELDS FOR MICHAEL BEAN 1-31-2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANNETTA FIELDS FOR MICHAEL BEAN 1-31-2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MCKENZIE RUSH FOR SHAWNA RUSH 02-11-2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MCKENZIE RUSH FOR SHAWNA RUSH 02-11-2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MCKENZIE RUSH FOR RONALD RUSH 02/11/2022

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MCKENZIE RUSH FOR RONALD RUSH 02/11/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MICHAEL K BEAN UNCLAIMED

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MICHAEL K BEAN UNCLAIMED

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LENORA LYNN BEAN UNCLAIMED

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LENORA LYNN BEAN UNCLAIMED

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LARRY WAYNE BEAN UNCLAIMED

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LARRY WAYNE BEAN UNCLAIMED

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LISA MARIE ANDREWS UNCLAIMED

03/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: LISA MARIE ANDREWS UNCLAIMED

ORIGINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

03/28/2022: ORIGINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER; Party: BIRDWELL, VIRGINIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: LT; Description: LETTER; Party: BEAN, LENORA LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST; Party: CLEARY, CONOR P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DEPUTY WARDEN EMMER BRANCH FOR LEONARD LEON BEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: EMILY JEANTET 01/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: GARY JEANTET 01/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: BRENDA BEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: VIRGINIA BEAN BIRDWELL 01/28/2022; Party: BIRDWELL, VIRGINIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ALFRED BEAN 1-29-2022; Party: BEAN, ALFRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANNETTA FIELDS FOR CURTIS BEAN 01-31-2022; Party: BEAN, CURTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION TO QUIET TITLE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND PARTITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: QUIET; Description: QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: QUIET TITLE(QUIET); Filed By: PATTERSON, DEBORAH; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less