This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 02:07:19 (UTC).

PATRIOT RENTALS, LLC, Plaintiff, vs. CASEY ROSS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 PATRIOT RENTALS, LLC, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASEY ROSS, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-64

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRIOT RENTALS, LLC

Defendant

ROSS, CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMUNYON, JUSTIN

118 N Independence

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

01/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE - CASEY ROSS SERVED PERSONALLY 1/19/22

01/24/2022: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE - CASEY ROSS SERVED PERSONALLY 1/19/22

JOURNAL ENTRY

02/08/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT FOR PLAIN; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: ROSS, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPJP; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS: PLTF/LAMUNYON; DEFT/PRESENT; DEFT CONFESSES JUDGMENT; HEARING HELD; JUDGMENT PLTF $1937.50+CC+FEES+INTEREST+ $193.75 ATTNY FEES; POSSESSION 2-11-22 @ 9 AM; Count: 1; Party: ROSS, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE - CASEY ROSS SERVED PERSONALLY 1/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-510626 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: LAMUNYON LAW FIRM TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2022-64: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2022-64: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2022-64: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SEIGARS, JASON TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS $1937.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS $1937.50(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: PATRIOT RENTALS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMUNYON, JUSTIN