This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 16:53:28 (UTC).

PARK LANE ESTATES V. BRANDI MELTON

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 PARK LANE ESTATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRANDI MELTON. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, RAFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0193

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, RAFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK LANE ESTATES

Defendant

MELTON, BRANDI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINDINGS AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 07/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER - SERVED BRANDI MELTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE ENTRY AND DETAINER - (JCSO); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less