This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 02:30:46 (UTC).

Oklahoma Tax Commission v. Parker, Nicholas et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Oklahoma Tax Commission filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Parker, Nicholas. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-19

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oklahoma Tax Commission

Defendants

BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

Parker, Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McGlasson, Scott

Attorney at Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson

P.O. Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

Paul, Elizabeth

Attorney at Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP

Po Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR STATE TAX ENFORCEMENT

01/20/2022: APPLICATION FOR STATE TAX ENFORCEMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

03/17/2022: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

03/17/2022: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

04/15/2022: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

04/29/2022: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

04/29/2022: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

05/09/2022: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY; Party: BANTA, MARY CHARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: APPLICATION FOR STATE TAX ENFORCEMENT; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Oklahoma Tax Commission

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL, ELIZABETH