This case was last updated from Beckham County Courts on 08/30/2021 at 12:12:30 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA HOUSING LLC V. MICHAEL MICKEY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 OKLAHOMA HOUSING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL MICKEY. This case was filed in Beckham County Courts, Beckham County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0353

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Beckham, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKLAHOMA HOUSING LLC

Defendant

MICKEY, MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PLAIN ANNOUNCES DISMISSAL. CASE DISMISSED. MKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 02/08/21 @ 8:30. MKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: DUE TO MORATORIUM AND DEFT. STATES HE HAS COVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: COURT ORDER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 4024 OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ISSUE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER UP TO $5000; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less