This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 03:04:35 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO V. LAYNE HOWARD ZUROFF

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LAYNE HOWARD ZUROFF. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0148

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO

Defendant

ZUROFF, LAYNE HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOLDEN, ANDREA

SOUTHERLAND, DARON

CLEARY, JONATHAN M.

 

Court Documents

PETITION, FILED

09/08/2021: PETITION, FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

09/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

09/08/2021: APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

NOTICE OF PLAIN 'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, FILED

02/22/2022: NOTICE OF PLAIN 'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF PLAIN 'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER/RESPONSE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SECURITY COMMISSION TO PRODUCE EMPLOYMENT RECORDS, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUBSEQUENT ORDERS DIRECTING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, FILEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION, FILED; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDEN, ANDREA