This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 05/07/2022 at 11:30:46 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO V. KEVIN LEE MCNEELY, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KEVIN LEE MCNEELY. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MORRIS, DENNIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0171

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MORRIS, DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UNIO

Defendants

MCNEELY, COURTNEY SUZANNE

MCNEELY, KEVIN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOLDEN, ANDREA

CLEARY, JONATHAN M.

 

Court Documents

PETITION, FILED

09/27/2021: PETITION, FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, FILED

09/27/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

09/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

09/27/2021: APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

ANSWER, FILED

10/28/2021: ANSWER, FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF PLAIN 'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SECURITY COMMISSION TO PRODUCE EMPLOYMENT RECORDS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUBSEQUENT ORDERS DIRECTING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION, FILED; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDEN, ANDREA