This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 15:24:21 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UN V. KAITLIN MASON, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAITLIN MASON. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0070

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKLAHOMA EDUCATORS CREDIT UN

Defendants

MASON, TIMOTHY D

MASON, KAITLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOLDEN, ANDREA M

4001 Nw Expressway

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF PLAIN 'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMBINED APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURN / RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ATTY REQ TO BE TAKEN OFF CIVIL MOTION DOCKET / REMOVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MOTION DOCKET NOTICE SENT FOR 10-13-21 @ 1:30 /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SECURITY COMMISSION TO PRODUCE EMPLOYMENT RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION-$10001.00 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less