This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 14:56:03 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA AGCREDIT V. PEGGY L LEE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 OKLAHOMA AGCREDIT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PEGGY L LEE. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0055

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKLAHOMA AGCREDIT

Defendants

LACEY-PIONEER ABSTRACT CO INC

LEE, PEGGY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PERRYMAN, JAMES M

Attorney at PERRYMAN & PERRYMAN, LLP

118 North Fourth Street

Chickasha, OK 73018

CHEEK, DAVID A

Attorney at CHEEK AND FALCONE PLLC

6301 Waterford Boulevard, Suite 320

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO ANSWER PLAIN S' FIRST INTERROGATORIES AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMPANY'S APPLICATION FOR THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LACEY-PIONEER ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FIRST INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAIN 'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT LACEY-PIONEER ABSTRACT COMPANY'S APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION-$10001.00 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less