This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 13:14:22 (UTC).

Oakmont Estates II, Plaintiff, v. Garry Johnson, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Oakmont Estates II, Plaintiff, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Garry Johnson, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****20-4

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oakmont Estates Ii

Defendant

Johnson, Garry

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

01/17/2020: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: 2-5-20 TO GARRY JOHNSON

02/06/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: 2-5-20 TO GARRY JOHNSON

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

03/02/2020: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED;; Party Details; Defendant: Johnson, Garry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JUDG; Description: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: 2-5-20 TO GARRY JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 83492 VOIDED ON 01/17/2020 BY OSCN\CASEYRANALLO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-83493 ON 01/17/2020. PAYOR: OAKMONT FAMILY HOUSING TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-4: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-4: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2020-4: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-4: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-83492 ON 01/17/2020. PAYOR: OAKMONT ESTATES FAMILY HOUSING TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-4: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-4: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2020-4: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-4: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE WALLACE, JANA KAY TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Oakmont Estates Ii

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less