This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 06:31:17 (UTC).

Oak Park Village v. Smith, Lyllian Nicole

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Oak Park Village filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Smith, Lyllian Nicole. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hert, R. L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-655

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hert, R. L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oak Park Village LLC

Defendants

Reece, Josiah Lee

Smith, Lyllian Nicole

 

Court Documents

RETURN AFFIDAVIT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED "BILL SMITH"? PERSONALLY 6-8-18 SERVED LYLLIAN SMITH AND JOSIAH REECE BY POSTING AND CERTIFIED MAIL 6-11-18 PSS/$85

06/12/2018: RETURN AFFIDAVIT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED "BILL SMITH"? PERSONALLY 6-8-18 SERVED LYLLIAN SMITH AND JOSIAH REECE BY POSTING AND CERTIFIED MAIL 6-11-18 PSS/$85

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/31/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

12/26/2018: RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

12/26/2018: RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN MAIL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: continued from 7-16-18: $1,047 rent/damages/cc; Party: Oak Park Village LLC; Docket: R. L. Hert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: Oak Park Village LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE HERT: THE PLAIN APPEARS BY REPRESENTATIVE. THE DEFENDANT DOES NOT APPEAR. THE COURT FINDS THE DEFENDANT HAS BEEN SERVED AND GRANTS A DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,647 PLUS COURT COST AND INTEREST PER STATUTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE HERT: THE PLAIN APPEARS PRO SE. THE DEFENDANT DOES NOT APPEAR. THE COURT CONTINUES THIS CASE FOR JULY 30, 2018 AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: $1,047 rent/damages/cc-possession granted 6-18-18-certified mail and posting-leaving copy with Bill Smith-co-resident; Party: Oak Park Village LLC; Docket: R. L. Hert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: possession less than $5000 served "Bill Smith"? personally 6-8-18 served Lyllian Smith and Josiah Reece by posting and certified mail 6-11-18 PSS/$85; Party: Oak Park Village LLC; Docket: R. L. Hert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE HERT: THE PLAIN APPEARS BY REPRESENTATIVE. THE DEFENDANT DOES NOT APPEAR. THE COURT FINDS THE DEFENDANT HAS BEEN SERVED AND GRANTS POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN AFFIDAVIT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED "BILL SMITH"? PERSONALLY 6-8-18 SERVED LYLLIAN SMITH AND JOSIAH REECE BY POSTING AND CERTIFIED MAIL 6-11-18 PSS/$85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-575061 ON 06/07/2018. PAYOR: OAK PARK VILLAGE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-655: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-655: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-655: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HERT, R. L. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Oak Park Village LLC

    Read MoreRead Less