This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 05:53:57 (UTC).

Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC v. Bennett, Amanda et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bennett, Amanda. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Kistler, Stephen R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-412

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Kistler, Stephen R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC

Defendants

Bennett, Amanda

Bennett, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faber and Brand LLC

Attorney at Faber and Brand LLC

Po Box 10110

Columbia, MO 65205

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT

07/05/2018: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

07/05/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

11/06/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

02/03/2020: RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - MAIL

07/22/2019: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - MAIL

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED/STAMPED G. PARRISH FOR WILHOIT PROPERTIES, INC./DATED 7-25-2019

07/29/2019: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED/STAMPED G. PARRISH FOR WILHOIT PROPERTIES, INC./DATED 7-25-2019

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

01/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

11/12/2019: ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

07/05/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT; Party: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Party: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-657096 ON 05/20/2021. PAYOR: FABER AND BRAND LLC FOR NORTHWEST ARKANSAS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-412: $83.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-412: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-412: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-412: $7.98 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIM; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - MAIL (AMANDA BENNETT); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals LLC

    Read MoreRead Less