This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 04/01/2022 at 22:24:32 (UTC).

NORTH GRAND MOBILE HOME & RV V. NATASHA DESPAIN

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 NORTH GRAND MOBILE HOME RV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATASHA DESPAIN. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0241

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH GRAND MOBILE HOME & RV

Defendant

DESPAIN, NATASHA

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

06/25/2021: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/25/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER AND RETURN OF SERVICE - NATASHA DESPAIN PERSONALY

06/29/2021: ORDER AND RETURN OF SERVICE - NATASHA DESPAIN PERSONALY

CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BUT

07/02/2021: CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BUT

CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BUT

07/02/2021: CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BUT

WRIT OF ASSIST AND RETURN - DEFENDANT NOT FOUND

07/06/2021: WRIT OF ASSIST AND RETURN - DEFENDANT NOT FOUND

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILED COPY TO PLAIN AND DEFENDANT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WRIT OF ASSIST AND RETURN - DEFENDANT NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING WRIT TO DCSO FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT APPROVES A WRIT OF ASSISTANCE FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WAS SERVED; COURT GRANTS EVICTION AND COURT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED ON 06/28/21 BY DSCO - $50.00 SHERIFF SERVICE FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND RETURN OF SERVICE - NATASHA DESPAIN PERSONALY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING TO DCSO FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less