This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 04:59:09 (UTC).

Norman Regional Hospital Authority, Plaintiff, v. Robby Daws, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Norman Regional Hospital Authority, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robby Daws, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stice, Steve. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2639

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stice, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norman Regional Hospital Authority

Defendant

Daws, Robby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Irby, Bobby G

Attorney at C/O MORGAN AND ASSOCIATES 2601 NW EXPRESSWAY STE 205E

Okla City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

05/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT

CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

06/18/2018: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

07/19/2018: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

08/31/2018: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

05/30/2019: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

CO: NO SERVICE ALIAS MAY ISSUE (JHN)

06/21/2019: CO: NO SERVICE ALIAS MAY ISSUE (JHN)

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

02/03/2020: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

CO: NO SERVICE. ALIAS MAY ISSUE. *** JHN ***

03/11/2020: CO: NO SERVICE. ALIAS MAY ISSUE. *** JHN ***

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: ALIAS HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CO: NO SERVICE. ALIAS MAY ISSUE. *** JHN ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • HearingEvent: ALIAS HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CO: NO SERVICE ALIAS MAY ISSUE (JHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • HearingEvent: ALIAS HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1019029 ON 05/31/2018. PAYOR: MORGAN AND ASSOCIATES PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-2639: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-2639: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-2639: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE STICE, STEVE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less