This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 03/07/2022 at 02:23:46 (UTC).

Norman Regional Hospital Authority, Plaintiff, v. Christi Joanna Carruth, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Norman Regional Hospital Authority, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christi Joanna Carruth, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Napoli, Jequita H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2638

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Napoli, Jequita H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norman Regional Hospital Authority

Defendant

Carruth, Christi Joanna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Irby, Bobby G

Attorney at C/O MORGAN AND ASSOCIATES 2601 NW EXPRESSWAY STE 205E

Okla City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

05/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF HEARING/ 7-16-18 AT 1:30PM / NAPOLI

06/21/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING/ 7-16-18 AT 1:30PM / NAPOLI

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ POTTAWATOMIE SHERIFF / SERVED BY LEAVING A COPY WITH CAROLIN MCBRIDE AT RESIDENCE / 6-15-18

07/13/2018: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ POTTAWATOMIE SHERIFF / SERVED BY LEAVING A COPY WITH CAROLIN MCBRIDE AT RESIDENCE / 6-15-18

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (JN)

07/16/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (JN)

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/16/2018: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

07/26/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

GARNISHMENTRELEASE

12/31/2018: GARNISHMENTRELEASE

RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIENS

01/28/2019: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: GARNISHMENTRELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCode: GSS; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS SERVED / CM / GREEN CARD RETURNED SB VERA RICHARDS FOR MAUD INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT / 8-30-18; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1033099 ON 08/23/2018. PAYOR: MORGAN & ASSOCIATES PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 106.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-2638: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-2638: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-2638: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. SC-2018-2638: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-2638: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. SC-2018-2638: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-2638: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1019040 ON 05/31/2018. PAYOR: MORGAN AND ASSOCIATES PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-2638: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-2638: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-2638: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE NAPOLI, JEQUITA H. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1)

    Read MoreRead Less