This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 08:07:16 (UTC).

NORMAN REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM V. MICHAEL DAVID MOORE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 NORMAN REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MICHAEL DAVID MOORE,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0038

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM

Defendants

MOORE, MICHAEL DAVID

MOORE, JOLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LENZ, LESLIE E.

Union Plaza, Suite 225, 3030 N.W. Expressway

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

01/24/2020: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOLENE SERVED 2-24-2020

02/27/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOLENE SERVED 2-24-2020

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL SERVED 1-28-2020

02/27/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL SERVED 1-28-2020

FILE AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO

05/29/2020: FILE AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO

FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIENS

10/14/2021: FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PAYMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOLENE SERVED 2-24-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL SERVED 1-28-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less